THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:46:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sambalpur University, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS, 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6, 1-(888)-563-3732
Date Received: 17 May 2016

Instructions/Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc
111 Regis Street South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1 888 563 3732 Ext. 1
Date Received: 31 Aug 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL
Medical School: Sambalpur University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS, 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6, 1-(888)-563-3732
Date Received: 17 May 2016

Instructions/Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc
111 Regis Street South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1 888 563 3732 Ext. 1
Date Received: 31 Aug 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 Feb 2009
Summary of Decision:
On February 13, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ganapathy committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice, under clause 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code ("the Code") which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991.

Dr. Ganapathy, a neurologist, saw Ms. X, a patient, on two occasions in 2001. At one of these consultations, Dr. Ganapathy hugged Ms. X. In March 2002, Dr. Ganapathy was charged by the Ontario Provincial Police with sexual assault contrary to the Criminal Code relating to this incident. In April 2003, Dr. Ganapathy pleaded guilty to common assault contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code. The Crown did not proceed with the sexual assault charge. Dr. Ganapathy was granted a conditional discharge, fined a victim fine surcharge, and was given twelve months probation. Dr. Ganapathy brought this matter to the attention of the College on his 2004 CPSO Annual Renewal form.

On January 6, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Ganapathy shall appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
2. Dr. Ganapathy shall pay costs to the College in the amount of $7,300.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 18, 2008

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 13 Feb 2009
Summary of Decision:
On February 13, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ganapathy committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice, under clause 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code ("the Code") which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991.

Dr. Ganapathy, a neurologist, saw Ms. X, a patient, on two occasions in 2001. At one of these consultations, Dr. Ganapathy hugged Ms. X. In March 2002, Dr. Ganapathy was charged by the Ontario Provincial Police with sexual assault contrary to the Criminal Code relating to this incident. In April 2003, Dr. Ganapathy pleaded guilty to common assault contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code. The Crown did not proceed with the sexual assault charge. Dr. Ganapathy was granted a conditional discharge, fined a victim fine surcharge, and was given twelve months probation. Dr. Ganapathy brought this matter to the attention of the College on his 2004 CPSO Annual Renewal form.

On January 6, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Ganapathy shall appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
2. Dr. Ganapathy shall pay costs to the College in the amount of $7,300.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 18, 2008

Training

Medical School: Sambalpur University, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1990
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 1990