THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1974
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
1525 Albion Road
Toronto Ontario M9V 5G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 236-9728
Fax: (416) 744-8106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Dulce Bismonte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jun 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
1525 Albion Road
Toronto Ontario M9V 5G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 236-9728
Fax: (416) 744-8106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Dulce Bismonte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jun 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA DULCE BUENAFE BISMONTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISMONTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA DULCE BUENAFE BISMONTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISMONTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1990