THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-1630 Ness Ave
Winnipeg MB R3J 3X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204-942-4808
Fax: 204-956-0587
Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Extension: 2287
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Sciences Centre
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg Manitoba R3E 0W3
Phone: (204) 787-3121
Fax: (204) 787-7086

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 09 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-1630 Ness Ave
Winnipeg MB R3J 3X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204-942-4808
Fax: 204-956-0587
Address: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Extension: 2287
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Sciences Centre
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg Manitoba R3E 0W3
Phone: (204) 787-3121
Fax: (204) 787-7086

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 09 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE DOUGLAS CAMPBELL HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORNE DOUGLAS CAMPBELL HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1990