THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:03:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: MCI The Doctor's Office
Bramelea City Centre
25 Peel Centre Drive
Brampton Ontario L6T 3R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 793-7077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: MCI The Doctor's Office
Six Points Plaza
5230 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke Ontario M9B 1A8
Phone: (416) 234-8668
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Huron Square Medical Centre
Huron Square
14 - 2500 Hurontario St
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1N4
Phone: (905) 897-6160
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-3869 Jane St
North York ON M3N 2K1
Phone: 4166367077
Fax: 4166350562

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: MCI The Doctor's Office
Bramelea City Centre
25 Peel Centre Drive
Brampton Ontario L6T 3R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 793-7077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: MCI The Doctor's Office
Six Points Plaza
5230 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke Ontario M9B 1A8
Phone: (416) 234-8668
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Huron Square Medical Centre
Huron Square
14 - 2500 Hurontario St
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1N4
Phone: (905) 897-6160
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-3869 Jane St
North York ON M3N 2K1
Phone: 4166367077
Fax: 4166350562

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIBI BASSILY SOURIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOURIAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FIBI BASSILY SOURIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOURIAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 1990