THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:52:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: Rai, Raminder Kaur (Used Until: 28 Feb 1999)
Medical School: Punjab University India, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3605 Genesys Parkway
Grand Blanc Michigan 48439
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (810) 606-7155
Fax: 810 606 7152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Rai, Raminder Kaur (Used Until: 28 Feb 1999)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Punjab University India, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3605 Genesys Parkway
Grand Blanc Michigan 48439
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (810) 606-7155
Fax: 810 606 7152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMINDER KAUR BHANGU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANGU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMINDER KAUR BHANGU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANGU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Punjab University India, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1990