THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:56:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GAELIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family Health Team
Civic Campus Ottawa Hospital
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Family Medicine Centre
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GAELIC
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family Health Team
Civic Campus Ottawa Hospital
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Family Medicine Centre
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
26 Jan 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 26 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 12:00 p.m., January 26, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Eoghan Brendan O'Shea:

(a) Dr. O'Shea shall not engage or associate himself with the provision
of complementary medical treatment for terminal disease;

(b) Dr. O'Shea shall not prescribe or compound "compound products" to
treat terminal disease in the context of a complementary medicine
practice;

(c) Dr. O'Shea shall not knowingly or with his consent work for or
associate himself with the Canadian Cancer Research Group or its
related organizations;

(d) To the extent Dr. O'Shea is permitted to practice Complementary
Medicine, Dr. O'Shea shall adhere to the College's policy on
Complementary Medicine as may be amended from time to time,
including, but not limited to, obtaining informed consent and
examining patients before prescribing to them; and

(e) At his own expense, Dr. O'Shea shall complete the College's Medical
Ethics and Informed Consent course, within one year of the date of
this Order.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 12:00 p.m., January 26, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Eoghan Brendan O'Shea:

(a) Dr. O'Shea shall not engage or associate himself with the provision
of complementary medical treatment for terminal disease;

(b) Dr. O'Shea shall not prescribe or compound "compound products" to
treat terminal disease in the context of a complementary medicine
practice;

(c) Dr. O'Shea shall not knowingly or with his consent work for or
associate himself with the Canadian Cancer Research Group or its
related organizations;

(d) To the extent Dr. O'Shea is permitted to practice Complementary
Medicine, Dr. O'Shea shall adhere to the College's policy on
Complementary Medicine as may be amended from time to time,
including, but not limited to, obtaining informed consent and
examining patients before prescribing to them; and

(e) At his own expense, Dr. O'Shea shall complete the College's Medical
Ethics and Informed Consent course, within one year of the date of
this Order.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 26 Jan 2010
Summary of Decision:
On January 26, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eoghan Brendan O'Shea had committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. O'Shea was medical director, from 2000 to 2002 and approximately September 2005 to June 2006, of Canadian Cancer Research Group (CCRG), a private complementary medicine organization whose patient population consisted of, among others, terminally ill cancer patients. While employed at, affiliated with or consulting for CCRG, Dr.O'Shea failed to maintain the standard of practice by: a) failing to examine the organization's patients or obtain informed consent before prescribing to them; b) failing to communicate with the organization's patients' conventional medicine physicians and/or oncologists; and c) failing to make reference in his charts to communications with the organization's patients' conventional medicine physicians and/or oncologists.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar impose immediately the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr.O'Shea's certificate of registration:

(a) Dr. O'Shea shall not engage or associate himself with the provision of complementary medical treatment for terminal disease;

(b) Dr. O'Shea shall not prescribe or compound "compound products" to treat terminal disease in the context of a complementary medicine practice;

(c) Dr. O'Shea shall not knowingly or with his consent work for or associate himself with the Canadian Cancer Research Group or its related organizations;

(d) To the extent Dr. O'Shea is permitted to practice Complementary Medicine, Dr.O'Shea shall adhere to the College's policy on Complementary Medicine as may be amended from time to time, including, but not limited to, obtaining informed consent and examining patients before prescribing to them; and

(e) At his own expense, Dr. O'Shea shall complete the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course, within one year of the date of this Order.

2. Dr. O'Shea pay to the College costs in the amount of $3, 650.00.

3. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.

 
 
Appeal: No Appeal

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 26 Jan 2010
Summary of Decision:
On January 26, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eoghan Brendan O'Shea had committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. O'Shea was medical director, from 2000 to 2002 and approximately September 2005 to June 2006, of Canadian Cancer Research Group (CCRG), a private complementary medicine organization whose patient population consisted of, among others, terminally ill cancer patients. While employed at, affiliated with or consulting for CCRG, Dr.O'Shea failed to maintain the standard of practice by: a) failing to examine the organization's patients or obtain informed consent before prescribing to them; b) failing to communicate with the organization's patients' conventional medicine physicians and/or oncologists; and c) failing to make reference in his charts to communications with the organization's patients' conventional medicine physicians and/or oncologists.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar impose immediately the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr.O'Shea's certificate of registration:

(a) Dr. O'Shea shall not engage or associate himself with the provision of complementary medical treatment for terminal disease;

(b) Dr. O'Shea shall not prescribe or compound "compound products" to treat terminal disease in the context of a complementary medicine practice;

(c) Dr. O'Shea shall not knowingly or with his consent work for or associate himself with the Canadian Cancer Research Group or its related organizations;

(d) To the extent Dr. O'Shea is permitted to practice Complementary Medicine, Dr.O'Shea shall adhere to the College's policy on Complementary Medicine as may be amended from time to time, including, but not limited to, obtaining informed consent and examining patients before prescribing to them; and

(e) At his own expense, Dr. O'Shea shall complete the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course, within one year of the date of this Order.

2. Dr. O'Shea pay to the College costs in the amount of $3, 650.00.

3. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.

 
 
Appeal: No Appeal

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 1990