THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:33:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058979228
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9540-163 st nw
edmonton Alberta T5P 3M7
Phone: 780 457 5511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 08 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058979228
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9540-163 st nw
edmonton Alberta T5P 3M7
Phone: 780 457 5511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 08 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAM WAH MONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAM WAH MONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 1990