THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:23:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie Jos Benoit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie Jos Benoit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 27 Jul 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Marie Jose Benoit to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 27, 2022:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Benoit engaged in professional misconduct.  Dr. Benoit, who resigned from the College effective July 1, 2022, has agreed, in the face of this investigation, to never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 27 Jul 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Marie Jose Benoit to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 27, 2022:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Benoit engaged in professional misconduct.  Dr. Benoit, who resigned from the College effective July 1, 2022, has agreed, in the face of this investigation, to never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 1991