THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:49:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Savaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Savaria (CPSO#: 63424 )
Business Address: Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030
Business Address: 1415
First Avenue West
suite 2000
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
519-470-3030 Extn: 216

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Savaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Savaria (CPSO#: 63424 )
Business Address: Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030
Business Address: 1415
First Avenue West
suite 2000
Owen Sound ON N4K 4K8
519-470-3030 Extn: 216

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Apr 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 1991