THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 414 Victoria Ave North
Suite M1
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-5221
Extension: 5
Fax: (905) 667-0508

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Suite M4
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON L8L 5G8
Tel: 905-529-5221
Date Received: 19 Feb 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Smosarski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 414 Victoria Ave North
Suite M1
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-5221
Extension: 5
Fax: (905) 667-0508

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Suite M4
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON L8L 5G8
Tel: 905-529-5221
Date Received: 19 Feb 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Smosarski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN SMOSARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMOSARSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN SMOSARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMOSARSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 1991