THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:15:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 485-9044
Fax: (416) 485-8525

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Giancola and A. Levitt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 485-9044
Fax: (416) 485-8525

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Giancola and A. Levitt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINA GIANCOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIANCOLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINA GIANCOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIANCOLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1994

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991