THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 19:47:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-274 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139699742
Fax: 6139697166

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.P. Kawam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-274 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139699742
Fax: 6139697166

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.P. Kawam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PHILIP KAWAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL PHILIP KAWAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991