THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:51:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Health Services
Oakville Site
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-4605
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Health Services
Oakville Site
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-4605
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES KNOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES KNOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991