THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:15:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 212-3502 Taylor St E
Saskatoon SK S7H 5H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 306-956-2500
Fax: 306-956-2501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 212-3502 Taylor St E
Saskatoon SK S7H 5H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 306-956-2500
Fax: 306-956-2501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALPHONSUS RUBAN JOE RAJAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAKUMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALPHONSUS RUBAN JOE RAJAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 17 Nov 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1991