THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:45:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1108 Palmerston Crescent, Kingston, Ontario K7P-2P5
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 1108 Palmerston Crescent, Kingston, Ontario K7P-2P5
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991