THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:43:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Meinert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Meinert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 27 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991