THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:24:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
2189 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 2B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 481-7720
Fax: (416) 481-9903

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.Y. Trinh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Trinh (CPSO#: 63708 )
Business Address: 303 - 2189 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 2B2
(416) 481-7720

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
2189 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 2B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 481-7720
Fax: (416) 481-9903

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.Y. Trinh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Trinh (CPSO#: 63708 )
Business Address: 303 - 2189 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 2B2
(416) 481-7720

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHIET YEN TRINH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHIET YEN TRINH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991