THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:48:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-3437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 336-3437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS STRANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS STRANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 Sep 2018
Summary of Decision:
On September 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. John Douglas Strang committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Strang is a family physician practising at a Clinic in Burlington. Dr. Strang received his Independent Practice Certificate in 1991.

The 2013 SCARP

In August of 2013, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (the "ICRC") considered two public complaints against Dr. Strang and directed in each case that Dr. Strang complete a specified continuing education or remediation program (SCERP), including attending and successfully completing a Medical Record-Keeping Course and undergoing a reassessment, approximately 6 months following completion of the course, consisting of a chart review of 15-20 charts. On March 4, 2015, Dr. Strang provided the College with the certificate of completion of the Apri128,2014 Medical Record-Keeping Course.

A reassessment of Dr. Strang's practice was completed in November 2015. The assessor concluded that Dr. Strang did not meet the standard of practice for medical record-keeping in 15 of the 16 charts reviewed.

The 2016 SCERP

In August of 2016, the ICRC considered the results of the reassessment. The ICRC ordered a verbal caution with respect to medical record-keeping, clinical care regarding test results and professionalism in failing repeatedly to respond to the College. The ICRC also issued a SCERP consisting of clinical supervision for a period of 6 months followed by a reassessment. Dr. Strang was informed of the ICRC's disposition on October 6, 2016. The decision sets out the requirements that Dr. Strang recruit a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College and that the Clinical Supervisor sign an undertaking with the College within 30 days of Dr. Strand's receipt of the decision.

On October 13, 2016, the College’s Compliance Case Manager wrote to Dr. Strang setting out Dr.Strang's obligations flowing from the ICRC's decision and requesting that a Clinical Supervisor be proposed immediately. On December 6, 2016, Dr. Strang proposed a physician to be his Clinical Supervisor. Dr. Strang was advised by the Compliance Case Manager that the proposed Supervisor would need to be approved by the College and to provide the proposed Supervisor with the SCERP document for his review. The Compliance Case Manager advised Dr. Strang to ensure that the proposed Supervisor contact the Compliance Case Manager to discuss the SCERP.

On January 6, 2017, the Compliance Case Manager advised Dr. Strang that the proposed Supervisor had not contacted the College. Dr. Strang responded the same day indicating that the proposed Supervisor was away over the holidays and that he would be contacting him.

On February 15, 2017, the proposed Supervisor contacted the Compliance Case Manager inquiring as to what the clinical supervision would entail. On February 22, 2017, the Compliance Case Manager responded to the proposed Supervisor, providing him with the relevant details of the clinical supervision including the SCERP and Individual Education Plan documents for his review. The proposed Supervisor then declined to be the Clinical Supervisor.

On March 15, 2017, the Compliance Case Manager informed Dr. Strang that the proposed Supervisor declined to be his Clinical Supervisor and advised that a new supervisor was required for approval by March 31, 2017, or the matter would be returned to ICRC. On March 24, 2017, the Compliance Case Manager sent a reminder email to Dr. Strang about obtaining a Clinical Supervisor. Dr. Strang responded to the email inquiring as to whether the College has any suggestions for supervisors. The Compliance Case Manager responded that the College did not maintain a list of clinical supervisors and offered that Dr. Strang speak with one of the College's medical advisors. On April 25, 2017, College Compliance Case Manager informed Dr. Strang that the ICRC would consider the matter on May 16, 2017.

On May 16, 2017 the ICRC met to consider Dr. Strang's non-compliance with the SCERP. The ICRC directed an undertaking be signed in lieu of completion of the SCERP.

On May 23, 2017, a registered letter was sent to Dr. Strang containing the draft undertaking for his review. The letter states that the College would return the matter to the ICRC if Dr. Strang was unwilling to sign the undertaking. The letter also specified that the ICRC might refer allegations of professional misconduct to the Discipline Committee with respect to non-compliance with the SCERP. No response to proposed undertaking was received from Dr. Strang.

On June 13, 2017, allegations of professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee. Dr. Strang retained counsel in March of 2018. On June 22, 2018, an undertaking executed by Dr. Strang reflective of the terms of the SCERP, together with the Clinical
Supervisor's undertaking, was received by the College.

Disposition

On September 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

- the Registrar suspend Dr. Strang's certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, commencing immediately.
- Dr. Strang appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Strang pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $6,000 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 10, 2018

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Aug 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 Sep 2018
Summary of Decision:
On September 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. John Douglas Strang committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Strang is a family physician practising at a Clinic in Burlington. Dr. Strang received his Independent Practice Certificate in 1991.

The 2013 SCARP

In August of 2013, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (the "ICRC") considered two public complaints against Dr. Strang and directed in each case that Dr. Strang complete a specified continuing education or remediation program (SCERP), including attending and successfully completing a Medical Record-Keeping Course and undergoing a reassessment, approximately 6 months following completion of the course, consisting of a chart review of 15-20 charts. On March 4, 2015, Dr. Strang provided the College with the certificate of completion of the Apri128,2014 Medical Record-Keeping Course.

A reassessment of Dr. Strang's practice was completed in November 2015. The assessor concluded that Dr. Strang did not meet the standard of practice for medical record-keeping in 15 of the 16 charts reviewed.

The 2016 SCERP

In August of 2016, the ICRC considered the results of the reassessment. The ICRC ordered a verbal caution with respect to medical record-keeping, clinical care regarding test results and professionalism in failing repeatedly to respond to the College. The ICRC also issued a SCERP consisting of clinical supervision for a period of 6 months followed by a reassessment. Dr. Strang was informed of the ICRC's disposition on October 6, 2016. The decision sets out the requirements that Dr. Strang recruit a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College and that the Clinical Supervisor sign an undertaking with the College within 30 days of Dr. Strand's receipt of the decision.

On October 13, 2016, the College’s Compliance Case Manager wrote to Dr. Strang setting out Dr.Strang's obligations flowing from the ICRC's decision and requesting that a Clinical Supervisor be proposed immediately. On December 6, 2016, Dr. Strang proposed a physician to be his Clinical Supervisor. Dr. Strang was advised by the Compliance Case Manager that the proposed Supervisor would need to be approved by the College and to provide the proposed Supervisor with the SCERP document for his review. The Compliance Case Manager advised Dr. Strang to ensure that the proposed Supervisor contact the Compliance Case Manager to discuss the SCERP.

On January 6, 2017, the Compliance Case Manager advised Dr. Strang that the proposed Supervisor had not contacted the College. Dr. Strang responded the same day indicating that the proposed Supervisor was away over the holidays and that he would be contacting him.

On February 15, 2017, the proposed Supervisor contacted the Compliance Case Manager inquiring as to what the clinical supervision would entail. On February 22, 2017, the Compliance Case Manager responded to the proposed Supervisor, providing him with the relevant details of the clinical supervision including the SCERP and Individual Education Plan documents for his review. The proposed Supervisor then declined to be the Clinical Supervisor.

On March 15, 2017, the Compliance Case Manager informed Dr. Strang that the proposed Supervisor declined to be his Clinical Supervisor and advised that a new supervisor was required for approval by March 31, 2017, or the matter would be returned to ICRC. On March 24, 2017, the Compliance Case Manager sent a reminder email to Dr. Strang about obtaining a Clinical Supervisor. Dr. Strang responded to the email inquiring as to whether the College has any suggestions for supervisors. The Compliance Case Manager responded that the College did not maintain a list of clinical supervisors and offered that Dr. Strang speak with one of the College's medical advisors. On April 25, 2017, College Compliance Case Manager informed Dr. Strang that the ICRC would consider the matter on May 16, 2017.

On May 16, 2017 the ICRC met to consider Dr. Strang's non-compliance with the SCERP. The ICRC directed an undertaking be signed in lieu of completion of the SCERP.

On May 23, 2017, a registered letter was sent to Dr. Strang containing the draft undertaking for his review. The letter states that the College would return the matter to the ICRC if Dr. Strang was unwilling to sign the undertaking. The letter also specified that the ICRC might refer allegations of professional misconduct to the Discipline Committee with respect to non-compliance with the SCERP. No response to proposed undertaking was received from Dr. Strang.

On June 13, 2017, allegations of professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee. Dr. Strang retained counsel in March of 2018. On June 22, 2018, an undertaking executed by Dr. Strang reflective of the terms of the SCERP, together with the Clinical
Supervisor's undertaking, was received by the College.

Disposition

On September 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

- the Registrar suspend Dr. Strang's certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, commencing immediately.
- Dr. Strang appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Strang pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $6,000 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 10, 2018

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Aug 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2020
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 10 Oct 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991