THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:57:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-9160 Bayview Ave
9160 Bayview Avenue
Unit 202
Richmond Hill ON L4B 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052370503
Fax: 9052370513

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Written requests for medical records should be faxed to Dr. Kako at (905) 554-0522
Date Received: 21 Jan 2008

Instructions/Address: Written requests for medical records should be sent to
Village Gate Medical
Unit 20
9665 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9V4
Date Received: 17 Jan 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-9160 Bayview Ave
9160 Bayview Avenue
Unit 202
Richmond Hill ON L4B 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052370503
Fax: 9052370513

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Written requests for medical records should be faxed to Dr. Kako at (905) 554-0522
Date Received: 21 Jan 2008

Instructions/Address: Written requests for medical records should be sent to
Village Gate Medical
Unit 20
9665 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9V4
Date Received: 17 Jan 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN YUZURU KAKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN YUZURU KAKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991