THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:38:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Port Arthur Health Centre
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Extension: 7753
Fax: (807) 346-6206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Nigro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Port Arthur Health Centre
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Extension: 7753
Fax: (807) 346-6206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Nigro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK NIGRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIGRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK NIGRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIGRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991