THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:35:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Written requests for records can be sent to

Dr. Anna Naylor
ATTN: Sue Thompson
119 Memorial Ave,
Suite 201C
Orillia, ON
L3V 5X1
Date Received: 19 Jul 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cambridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Written requests for records can be sent to

Dr. Anna Naylor
ATTN: Sue Thompson
119 Memorial Ave,
Suite 201C
Orillia, ON
L3V 5X1
Date Received: 19 Jul 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cambridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991