THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:08:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brookdale Family Clinic
304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 5G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-7100
Fax: (705) 743-7104
Address: Student Health Service
Trent University
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B8
Phone: (705) 748-1481
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Sobiera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brookdale Family Clinic
304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 5G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-7100
Fax: (705) 743-7104
Address: Student Health Service
Trent University
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B8
Phone: (705) 748-1481
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Sobiera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY SCOTT NEVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEVILLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY SCOTT NEVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEVILLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1991