THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:07:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Dept. of Mental Health & Addictions
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 49463
Fax: (289) 398-1067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darryl Wolski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wolski (CPSO#: 63848 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Dept. of Mental Health & Addictions
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 49463
Fax: (289) 398-1067

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darryl Wolski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wolski (CPSO#: 63848 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARRYL MARK WOLSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARRYL MARK WOLSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991