THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:23:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Paramedic Services
4330 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M3H5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 397 9071
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ornge Transport Medicine
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4W 5H8
Phone: (647) 428-2034
Fax: (647) 428-2006
Address: Emergency Services - Room C753
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Fax: (416) 480-4074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Prehospital and Transport Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Prehospital and Transport Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Paramedic Services
4330 Dufferin Street
Toronto Ontario M3H5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 397 9071
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ornge Transport Medicine
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4W 5H8
Phone: (647) 428-2034
Fax: (647) 428-2006
Address: Emergency Services - Room C753
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Fax: (416) 480-4074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Prehospital and Transport Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Prehospital and Transport Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL DAVID MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL DAVID MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991