THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:38:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
700 University Avenue
7th floor, Suite 7-624
Toronto, Ontario M5G 1Z5
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2911
Fax: (416) 946-4467

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
700 University Avenue
7th floor, Suite 7-624
Toronto, Ontario M5G 1Z5
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2911
Fax: (416) 946-4467

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 05 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILLIAN LAI-YUN SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILLIAN LAI-YUN SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991