THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:58:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3335 Dougall Avenue
Suite 101
Windsor Ontario N9E 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 221-8000
Fax: (519) 962-5784

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3335 Dougall Avenue
Suite 101
Windsor Ontario N9E 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 221-8000
Fax: (519) 962-5784

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYNDA CATHERINE HAMMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMMOND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYNDA CATHERINE HAMMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMMOND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Jun 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991