THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON
M9L 0A3
Phone: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 01 Aug 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clement Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jan 2025

Corporation Name: Dr. Clement Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON
M9L 0A3
Phone: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 01 Aug 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clement Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jan 2025

Corporation Name: Dr. Clement Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLEMENT WING TAI YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLEMENT WING TAI YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991