THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:41:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-4547
Address: 2101-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: 9056979770
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 222 King Street East #201
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Phone: 905-697-9770
Fax: 905-697-6452
Address: 49 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JONATHAN EISENSTAT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Eisenstat (CPSO#: 64111 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 81 Dunblaine Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5M 2S2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-4547
Address: 2101-222 King St E
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: 9056979770
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 222 King Street East #201
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Phone: 905-697-9770
Fax: 905-697-6452
Address: 49 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JONATHAN EISENSTAT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Eisenstat (CPSO#: 64111 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 81 Dunblaine Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5M 2S2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYON JONATHAN EISENSTAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISENSTAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYON JONATHAN EISENSTAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISENSTAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991