THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:46:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wardenwood Health Centre
2361 Warden Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1T 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 299-4999
Fax: 416-299-1322

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Former patients of Dr. Maingot-Douketis from the Yonge-Eglinton Medical Centre can access their medical records by contacting:
The Yonge-Eglinton Medical Centre
Suite 207
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto, Ontario
M4P 3H1
Tel: (416) 483-8382
Date Received: 26 Jan 2009

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wardenwood Health Centre
2361 Warden Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1T 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 299-4999
Fax: 416-299-1322

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Former patients of Dr. Maingot-Douketis from the Yonge-Eglinton Medical Centre can access their medical records by contacting:
The Yonge-Eglinton Medical Centre
Suite 207
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto, Ontario
M4P 3H1
Tel: (416) 483-8382
Date Received: 26 Jan 2009

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA JULIE MAINGOT-DOUKETIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAINGOT-DOUKETIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA JULIE MAINGOT-DOUKETIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAINGOT-DOUKETIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991