THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:36:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jul 2007
Summary:
Undertaking, effective July 12, 2007, by Dr. Robert Abraham AXFORD-GATLEY to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the "College"). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College's Registration Department): I, DR. ROBERT AXFORD-GATLEY, hereby, 1. resign from the College, effective immediately, 2. undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 3. consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public. 4. acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to discontinue its investigation of a public complaint and its Registrar’s investigation into allegations of sexual abuse of patients and improper prescribing and administering of narcotics. 8. acknowledge that this undertaking is irrevocable.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jul 2007
Summary:
Undertaking, effective July 12, 2007, by Dr. Robert Abraham AXFORD-GATLEY to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the "College"). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College's Registration Department): I, DR. ROBERT AXFORD-GATLEY, hereby, 1. resign from the College, effective immediately, 2. undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 3. consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public. 4. acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to discontinue its investigation of a public complaint and its Registrar’s investigation into allegations of sexual abuse of patients and improper prescribing and administering of narcotics. 8. acknowledge that this undertaking is irrevocable.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991