THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:52:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
F2 Room 203
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: (905) 575-2553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 31 Dec 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
F2 Room 203
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: (905) 575-2553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 31 Dec 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHOLA ROMMANE TRUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHOLA ROMMANE TRUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1991