THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Address: Ina Grafton Gage Home
40 Bell Estate Raod
Scarborough Ontario M1L 0E2
Phone: (416) 422-4890
Fax: (416) 422-1613
Address: Chester Village
3555 Danforth Ave.
Toronto Ontario M1L 1E3
Phone: (416) 466-2173
Fax: (416) 466-6781

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.R. Olsheski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jun 2023

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Address: Ina Grafton Gage Home
40 Bell Estate Raod
Scarborough Ontario M1L 0E2
Phone: (416) 422-4890
Fax: (416) 422-1613
Address: Chester Village
3555 Danforth Ave.
Toronto Ontario M1L 1E3
Phone: (416) 466-2173
Fax: (416) 466-6781

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.R. Olsheski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jun 2023

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE RICHARD OLSHESKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLSHESKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAYNE RICHARD OLSHESKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLSHESKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991