THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:49:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1744 Oriole Dr
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-2263
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 McKinnon drive
Espanola Ontario P5E1R4
Phone: 7058691420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1744 Oriole Dr
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-2263
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 McKinnon drive
Espanola Ontario P5E1R4
Phone: 7058691420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1991