THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Limestone City Sleep Laboratory
920 Princess St
Suite 110
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 547-9172
Fax: (613) 547-9910

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.B. Carlile Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2021

Corporation Name: J. Carlile Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jul 2012

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Limestone City Sleep Laboratory
920 Princess St
Suite 110
Kingston Ontario K7L 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 547-9172
Fax: (613) 547-9910

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.B. Carlile Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2021

Corporation Name: J. Carlile Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jul 2012

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN BATCHIN CARLILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLILE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN BATCHIN CARLILE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLILE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1991