THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:31:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doctor Paul William Gilbert Matthews Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doctor Paul William Gilbert Matthews Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 28 Sep 2024
Summary:
Interim Order
 
At its meeting on September 27, 2024, the ICR Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Paul William Gilbert Matthews’ certificate of registration under s. 59(2), effective September 28, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Apr 2022
Summary:
Effective August 3, 2023, Dr. Paul Matthews has completed the required elements of his SCERP dated April 6, 2022.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member.  A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review.   Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 28 Sep 2024
Summary:
Interim Order
 
At its meeting on September 27, 2024, the ICR Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Paul William Gilbert Matthews’ certificate of registration under s. 59(2), effective September 28, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Apr 2022
Summary:
Effective August 3, 2023, Dr. Paul Matthews has completed the required elements of his SCERP dated April 6, 2022.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member.  A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review.   Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP: 

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 28 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1991