THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère Street
Bruyère Memory Clinic
Suite 110Y
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 562-6322
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 630 Eagleson Rd
Kanata Ontario K2M 1H4
Phone: 6138780273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2225 Mer-Bleue Road
Orleans Health Hub
Ottawa Ontario K4A 3T8
Phone: (613) 562-6322
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frank Knoefel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Feb 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère Street
Bruyère Memory Clinic
Suite 110Y
Ottawa Ontario K1N 5C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 562-6322
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 630 Eagleson Rd
Kanata Ontario K2M 1H4
Phone: 6138780273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2225 Mer-Bleue Road
Orleans Health Hub
Ottawa Ontario K4A 3T8
Phone: (613) 562-6322
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frank Knoefel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Feb 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK-DIETRICH KNOEFEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOEFEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK-DIETRICH KNOEFEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOEFEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1991