THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:51:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hamburg University, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brant E. Bergstrome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Dec 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Hamburg University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brant E. Bergstrome Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Dec 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 08 Mar 2000
Summary of Decision:
On March 8, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Bergstrome(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee subsequently ordered the following penalty:

1. Dr. Bergstrome be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the Register;
2. Dr. Bergstrome(s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 12 months, to commence on April 1, 2000, six months of which will be suspended if Dr. Bergstrome fulfills the following conditions:

(a) that he attend at his own cost, a program satisfactory to the Registrar on boundary violations and provide proof to the Registrar of having attended and competed such a program; and

(b) that upon his return to practise and for a period of six months thereafter, he shall maintain, at his own expense, a peer relationship with a senior psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar which shall involve monthly discussions of boundaries and other clinical issues. Such senior psychiatrist shall provide a report to the Registrar at the end of each three month period that Dr. Bergstrome has attended upon him or her and participated in such discussions.

3. In the event that the Registrar is notified of a breach of any of the above conditions, the certificate of registration shall be suspended for the balance of the twelve month term, i.e., a further six months.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 08, 2000

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 08 Mar 2000
Summary of Decision:
On March 8, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Bergstrome(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee subsequently ordered the following penalty:

1. Dr. Bergstrome be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the Register;
2. Dr. Bergstrome(s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 12 months, to commence on April 1, 2000, six months of which will be suspended if Dr. Bergstrome fulfills the following conditions:

(a) that he attend at his own cost, a program satisfactory to the Registrar on boundary violations and provide proof to the Registrar of having attended and competed such a program; and

(b) that upon his return to practise and for a period of six months thereafter, he shall maintain, at his own expense, a peer relationship with a senior psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar which shall involve monthly discussions of boundaries and other clinical issues. Such senior psychiatrist shall provide a report to the Registrar at the end of each three month period that Dr. Bergstrome has attended upon him or her and participated in such discussions.

3. In the event that the Registrar is notified of a breach of any of the above conditions, the certificate of registration shall be suspended for the balance of the twelve month term, i.e., a further six months.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 08, 2000

Training

Medical School: Hamburg University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Jun 2024
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 02 Oct 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2000

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2000

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1991