THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:42:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 69 Highland Lane
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 508-0583
Fax: (905) 508-0143
Address: Suite 16
1415 Kennedy Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 2L6
Phone: 905-508-0583
Fax: 905-508-0143

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Shiraz University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 69 Highland Lane
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 508-0583
Fax: (905) 508-0143
Address: Suite 16
1415 Kennedy Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 2L6
Phone: 905-508-0583
Fax: 905-508-0143

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOSTAFA SHOWRAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOWRAKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOSTAFA SHOWRAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOWRAKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Aug 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Aug 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: Shiraz University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1991