THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:34:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Colombia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlos A. Morillo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Dec 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Colombia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlos A. Morillo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Dec 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 16 Aug 2018
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1991