THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:54:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Suite 4-230
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 3211
Fax: 4165868480
Address: Suite 500
491 Lawrence Ave West
Toronto Ontario M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Lapinsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Suite 4-230
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 3211
Fax: 4165868480
Address: Suite 500
491 Lawrence Ave West
Toronto Ontario M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Lapinsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN EARL LAPINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPINSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN EARL LAPINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPINSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 1991