THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:28:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Suite 3108
1001 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5S 3A6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christiane Dauphinais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Aug 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Suite 3108
1001 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5S 3A6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christiane Dauphinais Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Aug 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 1991