THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:40:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ahmadu Bello University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Steinbach Family Medical Center
Unit 100-381 Stonebridge Crossing
Steinbach Manitoba R5G 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204 326 3401
Fax: 204 326 8885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 08 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ahmadu Bello University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Steinbach Family Medical Center
Unit 100-381 Stonebridge Crossing
Steinbach Manitoba R5G 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204 326 3401
Fax: 204 326 8885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 08 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SULE GARBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SULE GARBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ahmadu Bello University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Oct 1991