THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202 - 203 Stonebridge Boulevard
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7T 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (306) 244-2977
Fax: (306) 665-0717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
USA - Kansas
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202 - 203 Stonebridge Boulevard
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7T 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (306) 244-2977
Fax: (306) 665-0717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
USA - Kansas
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWIN NII LARTEY LARKAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LARKAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWIN NII LARTEY LARKAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LARKAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cambridge School of Clinical Medicine, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 1992