THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:33:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge , Ontario
L4H 2T2
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 264 8311
Fax: 905 264 0801

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge , Ontario
L4H 2T2
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 264 8311
Fax: 905 264 0801

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WIESLAWA HANNA MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WIESLAWA HANNA MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 12 Apr 2013
Summary of Decision:
On April 12, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wieslawa Hanna Moore committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Moore met Mr. X in the spring of 2002, while Mr. X was completing a renovation contract at the clinic where she worked. Dr. Moore hired Mr. X to do renovations on her home in the summer of 2002. In 2002, Dr. Moore and Mr. X began a romantic and sexual relationship. Shortly thereafter, Mr. X moved into Dr. Moore's home with Dr. Moore and her daughter.

Between approximately 2002 and 2004, Dr. Moore provided isolated and incidental medical services to Mr. X, including sending Mr. X for testing and administering immunization shots. She did not inform Mr. X's family doctor about all of the care she provided. Dr. Moore did not bill OHIP for these services or maintain a patient chart. Dr. Moore states that the romantic relationship ended in or around March 2004. Between April 24, 2005 and July 28, 2005, Dr.Moore saw Mr. X as a patient at the clinic where she was employed on four occasions.

Between April 24, 2005 and December 29, 2005, Dr. Moore provided medical services to her daughter, Ms Y at the clinic where she worked. She also referred Ms Y to other physicians for follow up treatment and care. Dr. Moore billed OHIP for her services.

By providing medical treatment to Ms Y and Mr. X, Dr. Moore failed to recognize and maintain appropriate boundaries, and caused potential confusion as to whether she was acting in a professional or personal role in providing medical treatment.

The Committee ordered and directed that:
Dr. Moore appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
the Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration of Dr. Moore:
(i) Dr. Moore must successfully complete, at her own expense, the College's Understanding Boundaries in Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship course, within 12 months of the date of this Order.
Dr. Moore pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 12, 2013

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 12 Apr 2013
Summary of Decision:
On April 12, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wieslawa Hanna Moore committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Moore met Mr. X in the spring of 2002, while Mr. X was completing a renovation contract at the clinic where she worked. Dr. Moore hired Mr. X to do renovations on her home in the summer of 2002. In 2002, Dr. Moore and Mr. X began a romantic and sexual relationship. Shortly thereafter, Mr. X moved into Dr. Moore's home with Dr. Moore and her daughter.

Between approximately 2002 and 2004, Dr. Moore provided isolated and incidental medical services to Mr. X, including sending Mr. X for testing and administering immunization shots. She did not inform Mr. X's family doctor about all of the care she provided. Dr. Moore did not bill OHIP for these services or maintain a patient chart. Dr. Moore states that the romantic relationship ended in or around March 2004. Between April 24, 2005 and July 28, 2005, Dr.Moore saw Mr. X as a patient at the clinic where she was employed on four occasions.

Between April 24, 2005 and December 29, 2005, Dr. Moore provided medical services to her daughter, Ms Y at the clinic where she worked. She also referred Ms Y to other physicians for follow up treatment and care. Dr. Moore billed OHIP for her services.

By providing medical treatment to Ms Y and Mr. X, Dr. Moore failed to recognize and maintain appropriate boundaries, and caused potential confusion as to whether she was acting in a professional or personal role in providing medical treatment.

The Committee ordered and directed that:
Dr. Moore appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
the Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration of Dr. Moore:
(i) Dr. Moore must successfully complete, at her own expense, the College's Understanding Boundaries in Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship course, within 12 months of the date of this Order.
Dr. Moore pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 12, 2013

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 1992