THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:59:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-4942
Fax: (905) 721-6181
Address: 2-119 Isabella St
Campbellford ON K0L 1L0
Phone: 7056530404
Extension: 2
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcoux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-4942
Fax: (905) 721-6181
Address: 2-119 Isabella St
Campbellford ON K0L 1L0
Phone: 7056530404
Extension: 2
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcoux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARTHUR WILLIAM MARCOUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCOUX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARTHUR WILLIAM MARCOUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCOUX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992