THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:09:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kaloni, Shaila (Used Until: 22 Nov 2011)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 211
1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 337-1107
Fax: (905) 337-7361

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 21 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Kaloni, Shaila (Used Until: 22 Nov 2011)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 211
1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 337-1107
Fax: (905) 337-7361

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 21 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAILA PATODIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATODIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAILA PATODIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATODIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992