THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:56:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SINDHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 112-885 Progress Ave
Scarborough ON M1H 3G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-497-3303
Fax: 416-497-5458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anil K. Khithani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khithani (CPSO#: 65001 )
Business Address: Suite 206
3430 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2R5
(416) 497-3303
Business Address: 112-885 Progress Ave
Scarborough ON M1H 3G3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SINDHI
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 112-885 Progress Ave
Scarborough ON M1H 3G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-497-3303
Fax: 416-497-5458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anil K. Khithani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khithani (CPSO#: 65001 )
Business Address: Suite 206
3430 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2R5
(416) 497-3303
Business Address: 112-885 Progress Ave
Scarborough ON M1H 3G3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIL KANAYALAL KHITHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHITHANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIL KANAYALAL KHITHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHITHANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992