THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:05:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tufts University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 5612
Fax: (416) 603-4257

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 10 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tufts University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Extension: 5612
Fax: (416) 603-4257

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 10 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN MIKULIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKULIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN MIKULIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKULIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tufts University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 May 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 May 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 May 1993

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 1992
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 1992

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 1992