THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:36:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6960 Mumford Rd
Suite 0265
Halifax NS B3L 4P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-866-0609
Fax: 902-417-1553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Pottie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6960 Mumford Rd
Suite 0265
Halifax NS B3L 4P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-866-0609
Fax: 902-417-1553

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Pottie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN CHRISTOPHER POTTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN CHRISTOPHER POTTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992