THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:50:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 752 King Street West
Providence Care Hospital
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-544-4900
Extension: 53293
Fax: 613-544-4614

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.L. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Richardson (CPSO#: 65157 )
Business Address: 752 King Street West
Providence Care Hospital
Dept of PMR
D1.718
Kingston Ontario K7M 2G4
613-744-4900 Extn: 53268
Business Address: UNH - Toronto Rehab
Suite 10-107
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
(416) 597-3422

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 752 King Street West
Providence Care Hospital
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-544-4900
Extension: 53293
Fax: 613-544-4614

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.L. Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Richardson (CPSO#: 65157 )
Business Address: 752 King Street West
Providence Care Hospital
Dept of PMR
D1.718
Kingston Ontario K7M 2G4
613-744-4900 Extn: 53268
Business Address: UNH - Toronto Rehab
Suite 10-107
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
(416) 597-3422

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENISE LOUISE RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENISE LOUISE RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992